THE SEA MILLS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 301705
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Community Hall to local user groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
- Bristol City
Governance
Registration history:
- 07 July 1962: Standard registration
- 30 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 30 December 2009: Standard registration
- 10 January 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- THE SEA MILLS COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.75k | £10.01k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.22k | £19.23k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Submit annual return
Open in new window
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 MAY, 1962
Charitable objects
COMMUNITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
SEA MILLS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window