STURMINSTER AND STOCKWOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Family Nights Exercise Classes BBQ free fun days Community Social Nights Children's Christmas Parties Pensioner Christmas Hampers (members)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bristol City
Governance
- 13 October 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Boateng | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARK WILLIAM HARRIS | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Liam Hawkes | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Betts | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE JOHN PIDDEN | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amber Pidden | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
DEBBIE EAMER | Trustee | 10 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
BECKY KNIGHT | Trustee | 10 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.15k | £19.86k | £31.70k | £47.35k | £59.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.04k | £25.60k | £28.10k | £44.05k | £51.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £17.05k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 November 2024 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2024 | 268 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2024 | 268 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 24TH JUNE 1969
Charitable objects
A COMMUNITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
STOCKWOOD AREA (FORMERLY KNOWN AS STURMINSTER AREA)
Contact information
- Address:
-
STURMINSTER RD
STOCKWOOD
BRISTOL
BS14 8AU
- Phone:
- 01275832992
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window