Heath End Village Hall and Recreation Ground

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running of Village Hall for Community acitivities & private parties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 11 September 1962: Standard registration
- HEATH END VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- HEATH END VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- Heath End Village Hall and Recreation Ground (Previous name)
- HEATH END VILLAGE ROOMS TRUST (Previous name)
- Heath End Village Rooms Trust (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN GALE | Chair | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Jane Waterfield | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Waterfield | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM CARR | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemarie Pomroy | Trustee | 19 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANETTE MARGARET HEWITT | Trustee | 12 March 2005 |
|
|||||
MR TONY JEFFERY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA WOODS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JEAN PENNINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WARWICK LOVEGROVE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULINE ANNE POSTANCE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.30k | £29.70k | £30.31k | £56.96k | £37.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.92k | £20.12k | £27.00k | £63.27k | £43.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | N/A | £7.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 27TH OCTOBER 1941, UPDATED BY SCHEME SEALED 17 NOVEMBER 1997 as amended on 09 Feb 2022 as amended on 21 Feb 2024 as amended on 21 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF RECREATION GROUNDS, READING AND RECREATION ROOMS, LIBRARY, LECTURES, CLASSES, RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BAUGHURST WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oak Cottage
Baughurst Road
Baughurst
Tadley
RG26 5LP
- Phone:
- 01189814858
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window