BOLDRE WAR MEMORIAL RECREATION GROUND AND HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 09 May 1963: Standard registration
- BOLDRE WAR MEMORIAL HALL (Working name)
- WAR MEMORIAL RECREATION GROUND AND HALL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIM FARQUHAR | Chair |
|
||||||
Oliver Nathan Moore | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Neil Frederick Waterhouse | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Frances Patricia Mason | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Adams | Trustee | 10 November 2013 |
|
|||||
ANGELA GRAINGER | Trustee | 14 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
SARAH WALLBRIDGE | Trustee | 14 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALAN FRANKCOM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TONY BROOMFIELD | Trustee |
|
||||||
STUART JOHN MORTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.00k | £15.03k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.78k | £6.01k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 October 2021 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED OF 14 JULY 1920 AND SCHEME OF 20 AUGUST 1975. RULES ADOPTED AT AGM 1985 IN ACCORDANCE WITH CLAUSE 4(C) OF TRUST DEED AFOREMENTIONED.
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF A RECREATION GROUND AND A PARISH HALL.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JOHNS, BOLDRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Boldre War Memorial Hall
Pilley Street
Pilley
Lymington
SO41 5QG
- Phone:
- 01590673991
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window