Accounts and annual returns BOTLEY RECREATION GROUND

Charity Number: 301751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 November 2024 293 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 March 2023 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required