SOUTHBOURNE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Village hall for the use of the inhabitants of the parish of Southbourne without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for meetings, lectures and classes, and for other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation, with the object of improving the condition of life for the said inhabitants.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £40,240
Total expenditure: £30,349

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 July 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Justin Wilkins Trustee 15 February 2024
None on record
Ian Le Poidevin Trustee 15 February 2024
None on record
David Roy Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Joyce Roy Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
David Charles Barnes Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
MRS PAM DOBSON Trustee 12 March 1990
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £19.16k £44.07k £46.99k £50.83k £40.24k
Total expenditure £19.78k £65.55k £38.67k £50.70k £30.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £33.78k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 13 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 13 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 27 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 27 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 06 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 06 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 04 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 23 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Southbourne Village Hall
First Avenue
EMSWORTH
Hampshire
PO10 8HN
Phone:
07717811345
Website:

No information available