Financial history CHILWORTH PARISH HALL

Charity number: 301782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £39.09k £39.07k £53.30k £41.67k £40.97k
Total expenditure £52.33k £52.33k £31.13k £35.57k £36.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A