Trustees COPYTHORNE PARISH HALL
Charity number: 301790

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin John Lander | Chair | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hughes | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Howard-Jones | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Wiggins | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Graham Chillcott | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Robert Newell | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Paul Hayward | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
|||||
OWEN MILLS | Trustee | 04 October 2010 |
|
|||||
BARBARA DOROTHY MAY SMITH | Trustee | 04 October 2010 |
|
|
||||
Joy Vallis | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|||||
GRAHAM DOUGLAS PEARSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.