DARBY GREEN AND FROGMORE SOCIAL HALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Charity provides a building with two air conditioned rooms to hire and a kitchen is available. The facility is able to be used by the local community and groups further afield. We serve the elderly and young alike with fitness,dance, line dancing,tai chai, oer 60s club, gsd dog club, baby clinic and much more. The hall has disabled accsess and disabled toilet facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 21 September 1962: Standard registration
- 21 May 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
- DARBY GREEN AND FROGMORE SOCIAL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.95k | £23.32k | £27.39k | £26.73k | £33.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.75k | £16.52k | £18.22k | £24.11k | £33.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 APRIL 1955
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
DARBY GREEN AND FROGMORE AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window