EAST STRATTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a village hall for the use of the inhabitants of East and West Stratton, Woodmancott and the neighbourhood thereof, without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for meetings, lectures and classes and for other forms of recreation and leisure-time, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 26 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yvonne Patricia Thatcher | Trustee | 31 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS JON GREENWOOD | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE JANE DIXON | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JENNIE PURNELL | Trustee | 21 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
OLLY BRAMLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.68k | £17.03k | £20.00k | £8.08k | £9.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.37k | £8.13k | £23.76k | £9.23k | £9.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £12.87k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 17TH SEPTEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THEUSE OF THE INHABITANTS OF EAST AND WEST STRATTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEROF WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OROTHER OPTIONS INCLUDING FOR THE USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
EAST STRATTON, WEST STRATTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Stratton Close
East Stratton
WINCHESTER
SO21 3DX
- Phone:
- 01962774203
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window