Financial history VILLAGE HALL-EAST WOODHAY

Charity number: 301813
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £76.15k £24.59k £15.30k £12.33k £21.81k
Total expenditure £69.31k £12.62k £15.34k £19.86k £17.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £61.00k £20.71k £8.00k N/A N/A