Accounts and annual returns ECCHINSWELL VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATIONAL CENTRE

Charity Number: 301814
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 21 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 13 March 2024 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 10 February 2022 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required