Financial history HARDWAY ELSON AND DISTRICTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATIONS

Charity number: 301834
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £200.61k £162.72k £170.09k £79.16k £27.85k
Total expenditure £195.82k £165.73k £176.89k £81.03k £46.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £16.57k