VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of Village Hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 24 September 1962: Standard registration
- HAMBLEDON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET DIANE HARRISON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Dunkley | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Harrison | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rowenna Gordon | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eileen Haywood Richardson | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MYRNA MARY COATES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH MARION HALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE FOSTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE DAVINA WILKINS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.90k | £22.83k | £34.00k | £35.61k | £23.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.97k | £13.07k | £13.24k | £38.82k | £43.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £19.04k | £14.84k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18TH APRIL 1946 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 7TH DECEMBER 1961
Charitable objects
1. A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS LIBRARY LECTURE CLASSES RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS OR OTHERWISE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HAMBLEDON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS. 2. A YOUTH CLUB TO HELP AND EDUCATE GIRLS AND BOYS RESIDENT IN HAMBLEDON AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY THROUGH THEIR LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
HAMBLEDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
West Street
Hambledon
WATERLOOVILLE
Hampshire
PO7 4RW
- Phone:
- 02392632812
- Website:
-
hambledonhantsvillagehall.weebly.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window