PARISH HALL

Charity Number: 301847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Village Hall Activities for the villagers of Hawkley Village

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £11,052
Total expenditure: £25,002

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 April 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HAWKLEY PARISH HALL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanna Catherine Humphrey Chair 05 September 2019
None on record
Nicolas Pettman Trustee 29 January 2024
None on record
Stephen Atkins Trustee 29 January 2024
None on record
Edmund Robert Felton Peel Trustee 17 April 2023
None on record
James Stephen Winter Prutton Trustee 17 January 2022
None on record
Isabel Maria de Jesus Ferreira Large Trustee 06 September 2018
None on record
Simon Adler Trustee 19 January 2014
None on record
RICHARD LITTLE Trustee 26 October 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £21.80k £8.51k £25.48k £46.60k £11.05k
Total expenditure £12.96k £11.07k £17.56k £15.10k £25.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A £1.80k £1.00k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 05 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 19 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 15 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 15 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 02 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 16 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Christmas Cottage
Hawkley
LISS
Hampshire
GU33 6LX
Phone:
01730827507
Email:
No information available