Financial history KILMESTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £13.16k £16.08k £10.64k £14.09k £15.44k
Total expenditure £6.53k £16.16k £18.08k £21.08k £8.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A