Accounts and annual returns KING'S SOMBORNE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301866
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 October 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 November 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 01 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 01 January 2017 On Time