LYNDHURST AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association promotes for the benefit of the inhabitants of Lyndhurst and the surrounding area the advancement of education, social welfare, recreation and leisure activities. The Association operates a centre which provides a number of meeting rooms and office services for the use of community groups, individuals and commercial organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £32,994 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
Governance
- 19 September 1962: Standard registration
- LYNDHURST COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR ROB DEWING | Chair | 08 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Mark Rolle | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Reeve | Trustee | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Callow | Trustee | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Helen Weston | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Jerry Rickcord | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sara Kathryn Shelton | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN VICTOR HOWELL | Trustee | 04 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chris Willsher | Trustee | 04 May 2018 |
|
|||||
MR MIKE WESTON | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER GREEN | Trustee | 28 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.14k | £82.04k | £139.65k | £173.70k | £255.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.08k | £107.30k | £129.75k | £151.59k | £233.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £27.00k | £24.50k | £4.48k | £2.63k | £32.99k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 AUGUST 1944 AND SCHEME DATED 11 JULY 1961
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE, BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, PHYSICAL EXERCISE AND TRAINING AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA, BEING THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE SAID FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED:
Area of benefit
LYNDHURST, EMERY DOWN AND BANK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lyndhurst Community Centre
High Street
LYNDHURST
SO43 7NY
- Phone:
- 02380282267
- Email:
- admin@lyndhurstcomm.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window