The Warren Centre

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE HALL IS AVAILABLE TO HIRE FOR PRIVATE FUNCTIONS AS WELL AS ALL LOCAL COMMUNITY EVENTS. THE LARGE RECREATION FIELD IS OPEN ACCESS AND SUPPORTS ONE SENIOR FOOTBALL TEAM. A FENCED CHILDREN'S PLAY AREA IS AVAILBLE FOR THE YOUNGER AGES RANGE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 10 November 1971: Standard registration
- MICHELDEVER STATION COMMUNITY AND RECREATION CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cynthia Gostling | Chair | 29 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lea Pridgeon | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Coughtrey | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
BELINDA HARVEY | Trustee | 21 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.23k | £11.26k | £15.87k | £29.87k | £34.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.84k | £17.18k | £17.92k | £21.01k | £20.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 JULY 1971 as amended on 17 Oct 2022 as amended on 17 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
COMMUNITY AND RECREATION CENTRE
Area of benefit
MICHELDEVERAND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Warren Centre
Warren Corner
Andover Road
Micheldever Station
WINCHESTER
Hampshir
- Phone:
- 01962 217030
- Email:
- info@thewarrencentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window