Financial history COLONEL STRATTON BATE'S RECREATION GROUND

Charity Number: 301895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £150 £150 £153 £153 £203
Total expenditure £5.54k £3.24k £3.63k £3.12k £3.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A