Financial history NEW MILTON AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 301897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £117.98k £59.20k £74.44k £101.62k £116.96k
Total expenditure £90.73k £120.20k £64.42k £90.38k £86.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £30.28k N/A N/A