RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RECREATIONAL/SPORTS AREA FOR MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 03 October 1962: Standard registration
- PART OF NORTH BADDESLEY PARISH COUNCIL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David James Knight | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Glen Mathew Fielder | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roy Hector Walmsley | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Charlton Thompson | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.26k | £13.69k | £25.00k | £26.63k | £3.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.79k | £90 | £8.30k | £15.20k | £25.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.68k | N/A | £20.20k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 September 2024 | 219 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCLOSURE AWARD DATED 18 JULY 1867
Charitable objects
A PLACE OF EXERCISE AND RECREATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF NORTH BADDESLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 BADDESLEY CLOSE
NORTH BADDESLEY
SOUTHAMPTON
SO52 9DR
- Phone:
- 07768990706
- Email:
- theknightz@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window