Trustees NORTH WALTHAM VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 301905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR MIKE ROBINSON Chair 12 March 1991
None on record
Robert John Green Trustee 02 February 2025
None on record
Jonathan Turner Trustee 02 February 2025
None on record
David Evan James Trustee 28 January 2025
None on record
Andrew Burgess Trustee 28 January 2025
None on record
Nicola Holloway Trustee 28 January 2025
None on record
Christopher John Brummell Trustee 06 February 2024
None on record
George David Hayter Trustee 07 February 2023
None on record
Geoff Chapman Trustee 02 June 2015
None on record
ADRIAN MCLAUGHLIN Trustee 27 March 2012
None on record
Julia Florence Preston Trustee 01 January 2011
None on record
MRS Trish Wyatt Trustee 01 February 2010
None on record