PAMBER HEATH WAR MEMORIAL HALL

Charity Number: 301914
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To administer the village hall for the benefit of the inhabitants of the parish of Pamber.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £33,424
Total expenditure: £76,263

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Animals
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 March 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE FOR VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Escott-New Chair 30 May 2023
None on record
Scott Nash Trustee 28 June 2022
None on record
Susie Pickett Trustee 31 May 2022
None on record
CHRISTINE MCGARVIE Trustee 30 June 2020
IMPSTONE PRE-SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE HURST SCHOOL PTA
Received: On time
Donna Bluck Trustee 14 May 2019
None on record
Lynda Parker-Schwarz Trustee 16 May 2017
None on record
Jenny Marshall Trustee 16 May 2017
None on record
Amanda Davies Trustee 16 May 2017
IMPSTONE PRE-SCHOOL
Received: On time
Pauline Day Trustee 15 May 2014
None on record
HILARY WILLIAMS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.47k £39.16k £28.58k £38.62k £33.42k
Total expenditure £16.28k £13.54k £15.57k £41.65k £76.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.71k £8.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 23 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
19A Bell House Church Road
Pamber Heath
TADLEY
HANTS
RG26 3DZ
Phone:
01189700422
Email:
No information available