Accounts and annual returns PETERSFIELD SWIMMING POOL

Charity number: 301917
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 09 March 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2020 16 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 16 February 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2019 14 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 14 June 2020 On Time