Financial history PETERSFIELD SWIMMING POOL

Charity number: 301917
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £161.37k £238.14k £212.18k £81.04k £211.86k
Total expenditure £160.02k £178.96k £164.73k £173.47k £168.86k
Income from government contracts £3.25k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £8.00k £600 £32.00k £8.60k