ROCKBOURNE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROVISION OF VILLAGE HALL

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024

Total income: £12,659
Total expenditure: £10,495

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 July 1969: Standard registration
  • 15 November 2007: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
  • 15 November 2007: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAMES WESTWOOD-BEERE Trustee 29 May 2024
None on record
Diana Jane Gore Brown Trustee 05 May 2022
None on record
Bernice Julia Churchill Trustee 05 May 2021
None on record
Lucy Victoria Matthews Trustee 29 January 2019
None on record
KATHERINE ANNE EDINGTON BENTALL Trustee 07 May 2014
None on record
EDWARD DACRES OLIVIER Trustee
None on record
ADELE VIRGINIA HOLMES Trustee
None on record
JOY WOOD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £15.83k £35.33k £13.38k £11.71k £12.66k
Total expenditure £7.39k £30.52k £18.05k £9.91k £10.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £18.64k £2.67k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2023 07 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 09 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 16 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 16 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 11 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED 15 FEBRUARY 1900
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF A VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ROCKBOURNE
Registration history
  • 10 July 1969 : Standard registration
  • 15 November 2007 : Removed
  • 15 November 2007 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
The Dial House
Rockbourne
FORDINGBRIDGE
Hampshire
SP6 3NA
Phone:
01725518500
Email:
No information available