SELBORNE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity shall be the provision of a village hall for the use of the inhabitants of the parish of Selborne (without distinction of political, religious or other opinions) including meetings, lectures & classes, and for other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 05 October 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hayley Dawn Carter | Chair | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Rebbeck | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALAN GRIMMETT | Trustee | 10 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
DOUG ALLAN | Trustee | 10 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.71k | £23.41k | £24.51k | £9.73k | £10.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.59k | £14.57k | £32.98k | £8.30k | £12.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.78k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £17.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 06 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 16TH OCTOBER 1979 as amended on 12 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SELBORNE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SELBORNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Selborne Village Hall
High Street
Selborne
ALTON
Hampshire
GU34 3JW
- Phone:
- 07790892124
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window