SILCHESTER VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 301947
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides the facilities of a village hall for the benefit of the whole community. Certain extra functions are provided by the management committee to raise funds towards the necessary costs of maintenance of an elderly building.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £29,045
Total expenditure: £40,842

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 September 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Janet Earl Chair 11 October 2022
SILCHESTER VILLAGE HALL CIO
Recently registered
Kirstie Jones Trustee 04 November 2024
SILCHESTER VILLAGE HALL CIO
Recently registered
Richard John Baker Trustee 04 November 2024
SILCHESTER VILLAGE HALL CIO
Recently registered
Lyndon Austin Trustee 13 February 2024
SILCHESTER VILLAGE HALL CIO
Recently registered
Leigh Harrison Trustee 30 November 2021
SILCHESTER VILLAGE HALL CIO
Recently registered
Peter Allison Trustee 09 March 2020
SILCHESTER VILLAGE HALL CIO
Recently registered
Sarah Bradshaw Trustee 08 February 2018
SILCHESTER VILLAGE HALL CIO
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.53k £17.39k £17.33k £32.37k £29.05k
Total expenditure £18.28k £14.31k £17.93k £20.78k £40.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.28k £16.00k N/A £10.00k £6.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 February 2025 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 02 February 2025 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 04 February 2024 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 February 2023 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 March 2021 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Woodrow
The Common
Silchester
READING
RG7 2ND
Phone:
01189702251