Financial history WOOLSTON AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 302000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £43.66k £38.07k £37.39k £33.86k £43.37k
Total expenditure £28.32k £28.94k £31.28k £36.03k £44.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £14.86k N/A N/A £2.50k