HAMPSHIRE COUNTY FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Membership led organisation for young people between the ages of 10 and 28
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

24 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 19 May 1964: Standard registration
- HAMPSHIRE COUNTY FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS (Working name)
- HANTS YFC (Working name)
- HFYFC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Kennedy | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Hirst | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sian Gove | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
George Stirwell | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sam Dovey | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Tickner | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tom Marsh | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Gregory | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward Bartlett | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ollie Bailey | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Croft | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thom Smith | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Toby Giles | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Minchael Bailey | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Grace Welling | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Morgan | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Gates | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Attwell | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ed Sibley | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Lakin | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Monger | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Macpherson | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Bailey | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Othen | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.90k | £13.73k | £12.02k | £18.83k | £28.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.47k | £17.54k | £13.90k | £24.66k | £26.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 10 September 2020 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 13TH DECEMBER 1971
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN AGRICULTURE, HOME CRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS; AND (B) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH MEMBERS TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS, BEING FACILITIES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND WILL ASSIST IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR SPIRTITUAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES, SELF RELIANCE AND INDIVIDUAL RESPONSIBILITY SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
YFC OFFICE
Sparsholt College
Sparsholt
WINCHESTER
SO21 2NF
- Phone:
- 01962776270
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window