2ND THUNDERSLEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Aim of The Scout Association is to promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials, as responsible citizens and as members of their local, national and international communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 29 March 1963: Standard registration
- 2ND THUNDERSLEY BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip John Newton | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Morgan | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lea Aspinall GSL | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev ANDREW JULIAN HUDSON Chairman | Trustee | 19 May 2018 |
|
|||||
PETER FREDERICK KLINKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.02k | £1.86k | £29.00k | £27.40k | £28.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.41k | £4.26k | £20.52k | £29.95k | £27.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 April 2025 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 April 2025 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 04 JAN 1912 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 28 MAR 1949 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 18 FEB 1959 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 05 MAY 1967 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 19 JUL 1991 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 08 FEB 2018 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 30 APR 2019 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 12 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF THE 2ND THUNDERSLEY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
THUNDERSLEY AND SOUTH BENFLEET
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Kingsdown Walk
CANVEY ISLAND
Essex
SS8 9TZ
- Phone:
- 07799066365
- Email:
- Leaaspinall@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window