Financial history HUTTON (ALL SAINTS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £36.24k £28.40k £28.58k £26.19k £39.99k
Total expenditure £44.48k £16.68k £20.76k £29.43k £49.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £2.10k N/A N/A