HUTTON (ALL SAINTS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running Scout sections, Beavers, Cubs and Scouts with various internal and external activities for young persons in the Hutton area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 30 December 1963: Standard registration
- HUTTON (ALL SAINTS) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Mongan | Chair | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Green | Trustee | 19 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Symonds | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
BOB HAWKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAY ROBERT SHOREY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.24k | £28.40k | £28.58k | £26.19k | £39.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.48k | £16.68k | £20.76k | £29.43k | £49.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £2.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 11 AUGUST 1963 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED DATED 1955
Charitable objects
HUTTON (ALL SAINTS) SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
HUTTON AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 GREAT OAKS
HUTTON
BRENTWOOD
CM13 1AZ
- Phone:
- 07919246546
- Email:
- bhawkins3@outlook.com
- Website:
-
huttonallsaints.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window