CHELMSFORD DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting exists to actively engage and support young people in their personal development, empowering them to make a positive contribution in society. The District exists to develop Scouting and support groups/units to further that development to provide Scouting to those young people that want to join.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
600 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 08 May 1964: Standard registration
- CHELMSFORD AND DISTRICT (BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION) (Previous name)
- CHELMSFORD AND DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMY LOUISE ENGLAND | Trustee | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CLARKE | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Neil Missen | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Taylor | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Teri Oscroft | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Ball | Trustee | 16 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
DANYEL ROBERT HORNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR RICK BALDING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.64k | £10.52k | £41.34k | £78.98k | £97.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.25k | £22.44k | £51.78k | £74.51k | £89.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4TH JANUARY 1912 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 28TH MARCH 1949, 18TH FEBRUARY 1959, 5TH MAY 1967 AND 19TH JULY 1991
Charitable objects
CHELMSFORD AND DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Area of benefit
CHELMSFORD AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 SHIMBROOKS
GREAT LEIGHS
CHELMSFORD
ESSEX
CM3 1SG
- Phone:
- 01245360112
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window