8TH AND 9TH SCOUT AND GUIDE ASSOCIATION AND CO
Charity Number: 302040
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
- Essex
Governance
Registration history:
- 25 August 1970: Standard registration
- 17 July 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- 9TH CLACTON-ON-SEA (SALVATION ARMY) SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 12 FEBRUARY 1969 UPON TRUSTS OF SCOUT ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED DATED 1969
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
CLACTON-ON-SEA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window