Financial history FINCHINGFIELD SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302050
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.76k £10.79k £716 £9.31k £6.85k
Total expenditure £10.40k £4.55k £5.76k £8.77k £6.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A