7TH HARLOW SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting. the spiritual, mental and pysical development of Young People and adults
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 01 April 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RACHEL TENNISON | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Denise Dalby | Trustee | 01 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
IAN CAMPBELL ACSL | Trustee | 14 August 1999 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL DALBY CSL | Trustee | 07 July 1986 |
|
|
||||
PETER CRAFT SL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.49k | £29.88k | £18.93k | £21.18k | £38.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.10k | £6.92k | £12.54k | £23.35k | £39.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.19k | £11.17k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 April 2023 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF YOUNG PEOPLE OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP
Area of benefit
HARLOW
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 Ram Gorse
Harlow
CM20 1PY
- Phone:
- 01279425367
- Email:
- nigeldalby@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window