1ST/2ND PARKESTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 01 October 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rose Alice Underhill | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cara Alice Reid | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Anne Freeman | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew William Robert Carmichael | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alex Whiddett | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dean Trigg | Trustee | 03 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Underhill | Trustee | 20 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Justin Davis | Trustee | 20 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Tilley | Trustee | 20 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Mayo | Trustee | 20 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Glynis Patricia Zimmermann | Trustee | 26 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Watt | Trustee | 26 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Andrew Kimber | Trustee | 26 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN RONALD MAYO | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROGER PAUL STANLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.05k | £21.97k | £15.59k | £10.67k | £15.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.34k | £5.15k | £13.72k | £14.12k | £14.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.06k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER OF 4TH JANUARY 1912 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 28TH MARCH 1949, 18TH FEBRUARY 1959, 5TH MAY 1967, AND 19TH JULY 1991
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
HARWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 KRESWELL GROVE
HARWICH
CO12 3SZ
- Phone:
- 01255552804
- Email:
- rogerstanley25@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window