Financial history THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION BRISTOL WEST DIVISION

Charity Number: 302145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.62k £2.31k £2.08k £2.46k £2.46k
Total expenditure £2.16k £1.94k £14.48k £1.81k £1.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A