Financial history 7TH BRISTOL (CHRISTCHURCH CLIFTON) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £70.47k £45.89k £27.97k £15.87k £17.34k
Total expenditure £134.95k £7.67k £14.31k £47.89k £17.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £40.20k N/A N/A N/A