7TH BRISTOL (CHRISTCHURCH CLIFTON) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting activities. To promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials as individuals as responsible citizens and as a member of their local, national and international communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bristol City
Governance
- 12 December 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CARLTON JEFFERIS | Chair | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Moran | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David De Silva | Trustee | 14 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Hewitt | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Pablo Teale Gavriel | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Daniel Monks | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Richard Bonnick | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexander John Mulroy | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PAUL JAGROOP | Trustee | 09 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keith Osborne | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER BATEMAN | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.47k | £45.89k | £27.97k | £15.87k | £17.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £134.95k | £7.67k | £14.31k | £47.89k | £17.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £40.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP
Area of benefit
BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pavey House
Waterloo Street
Clifton
Bristol
BS8 4BT
- Phone:
- ++
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window