Trustees 7TH BRISTOL (CHRISTCHURCH CLIFTON) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 302149

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CARLTON JEFFERIS | Chair | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Moran | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David De Silva | Trustee | 14 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Hewitt | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Pablo Teale Gavriel | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Daniel Monks | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Richard Bonnick | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexander John Mulroy | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PAUL JAGROOP | Trustee | 09 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keith Osborne | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER BATEMAN | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.