LONG ASHTON (ALL SAINTS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Part of the National 'Scouts' Organisation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- North Somerset
Governance
- 14 May 1964: Standard registration
- 25TH BRISTOL (ALL SAINTS, LONG ASHTON) BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON GWYN JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Norris David Riley | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
matthew Wooldridge | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean Adrian Davin | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Krystina Louise Hartry | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PHILIP DOWNEY | Trustee | 01 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW TYAS | Trustee | 24 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
DOMINIC ANDERSON | Trustee | 24 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
DEBORA JEAN ERSKINE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.71k | £27.44k | £10.49k | £21.31k | £33.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.97k | £14.21k | £10.04k | £18.55k | £35.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 November 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4 JANUARY 1912 AND SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 28 MARCH 1949, 18 FEBRUARY 1959, 5 MAY 1967 AND 19 JULY 1991
Charitable objects
25TH BRISTOL (ALL SAINTS, LONG ASHTON) BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
ALL SAINTS, LONG ASHTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 YANLEIGH ESTATE
YANLEY LANE
LONG ASHTON
BRISTOL
BS41 9LP
- Phone:
- 07887662227
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window