26TH BRISTOL (NORTH COTE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potential. The method of achieving the aim of the Scout Association is by providing an enjoyable and attractive scheme of progressive training, based on the Scout Promise and law and guided by adult leadership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bristol City
Governance
- 12 February 1964: Standard registration
- 26TH BRISTOL, NORTH COTE, BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bethan Lora Guest | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Claire Forster | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Jones | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna-Clare Temple | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
George Anthony Fletcher | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alex Doerr | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Barton | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jill Neild | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Michael Bennett | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Helen Shirley Hobbs | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.86k | £44.59k | £67.63k | £91.38k | £95.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.24k | £33.32k | £56.81k | £144.35k | £76.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17TH DECEMBER 1962
Charitable objects
26TH BRISTOL, NORTH COTE, BOY SCOUT GROUP.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORTHCOTE
GREAT BROCKERIDGE
WESTBURY ON TRYM
BRISTOL
BS9 3TY
- Phone:
- 01179623382
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window