Financial history 1ST CURDRIDGE AND BOTLEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 302222
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £3.85k £2.14k £5.32k £1.10k £1.44k
Total expenditure £3.34k £3.44k £2.33k £2.80k £1.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A