15th Chandlers Ford (Allbrook & Otterbourne) Scout Group

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
See Scout Association web site (www.scouts.org.uk) for full details of Scouting activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 15TH CHANDLERS FORD SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- 15TH EASTLEIGH BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Whittlestone | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Roese | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Larby | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Nowell | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Saunders | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Bembridge | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Moody | Trustee | 10 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Barbara Deeks | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Denise Nowell | Trustee | 05 September 1988 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.02k | £25.31k | £21.47k | £14.31k | £13.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.61k | £12.34k | £18.21k | £21.73k | £17.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.91k | £8.00k | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Scout Association
Scout Hut
Boyatt Lane
EASTLEIGH
Hampshire
SO50 4LQ
- Phone:
- 0044
- Email:
- treasurer@15thcfscouts.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window