MILFORD AND KEYHAVEN SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Milford and Keyhaven Sea Scout Group (the 15th New Forest South) has been established for over 40 years and is part of the Scout Association. It has three sections the Beavers, the Cub Scouts and the Scouts. The Scout Hut is located in Keyhaven and activities include land based activities (indoors and outdoors), Kayaking and Sailing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 13 May 1964: Standard registration
- MILFORD AND KEYHAVEN SEA SCOUTS 15TH NEW FOREST SOUTH (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Banks | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Nicola Priest | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sue Pepper | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phil Butler | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tim Carnegie | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Faye Lavender | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tim Stickley | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.26k | £25.16k | £9.79k | £4.51k | £8.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.81k | £10.56k | £10.54k | £8.03k | £14.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4TH JANUARY 1914
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
MILFORD AND KEYHAVEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Milford & Keyhaven Sea Scout Group
Keyhaven
Lymington
SO41 0TP
- Phone:
- 07522652049
- Email:
- info@milfordseascouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window