1ST SHEET (ST MARY'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual social and spiritual potential as individuals as responsible citizens and as members of their local national and international communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 22 May 1972: Standard registration
- SHEET SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- SHEET SCOUTS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK HARVEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Georgina Racheal Hounslow | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luc Blais | Trustee | 23 July 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.67k | £35.01k | £26.41k | £31.73k | £37.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.50k | £19.42k | £24.33k | £20.93k | £29.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 February 2023 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 April 2022 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 September 2021 | 213 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 September 2021 | 213 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04 JAN 1912 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 28 MAR 1949 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 18 FEB 1959 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 05 MAY 1967 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 19 JUL 1991 AS AMENDED ON 08 FEB 2018 AS AMENDED ON 30 APR 2019 AS AMENDED ON 12 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
SHEET
Contact information
- Address:
-
Scout Association
Inmans Lane
PETERSFIELD
Hampshire
GU32 2AN
- Phone:
- 07493 431167
- Email:
- treasurer@sheetscouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window