Financial history 1ST PETERSFIELD BOY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.67k £20.86k £16.36k £24.91k £21.47k
Total expenditure £28.16k £14.05k £15.92k £22.68k £21.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A